Hello Students,

We all know that math question comes in every exam and math subject is important for all types of exams so today, we are sharing Vedic Maths Tricks Pdf for Fast Calculation Free Download for you. We all know that every exam has 20-25 maths questions and also we know every exam paper for a limited time so improve your perpetration with Vedic math in Hindi.

Sscresult.in is an online free notes pdf website, where we are sharing all types of pdf Vedic Maths Tricks Pdf download and New Syllabus, Competitive exams for UPSC, SSC, BANK, RAILWAY, LDC, NTPC and many other exams. Our Latest Vedic Maths Tricks PDF Free Download is very simple and easy to understand. We also cover basic subjects like Mathematics, Geography, History, General Science, Politics, etc. We also share study material including previous year question papers, current affairs, important sources, etc. for upcoming government exams.

### Vedic Maths Topics

 # TOPIC 1. Square of a number which ends with 5 2. Multiplication trick for Two 2-digit numbers 3. Multiplication of numbers whose last figures are the same & whose first figures add up to 10 4. Easy Subtraction by Vedic Sutra 5. Multiplication by 9’s 6. Mental Math tricks for fast multiplication with special numbers 7. Digit Sum 8. Calculation from left to right 9. Multiplication by the left to the right method 10. Short cut methods of multiplication 11. A general method to multiply any two-digit number with any two-digit number 12. A general method to multiply any three-digit number with any three digit number 13. Special numbers in multiplication 14. A general method to compute Squares 15. Method to compute the square root of the perfect square 16. General method to compute the Cubes 17. Method to compute cube root of the perfect cub 18. General method to find out the square root of any number in one line 19. Concept of Bar Numbers 20. Tests for Divisibility 21. Divisibility check by Osculator method 22. A general method for Division 23. Conversion of Fractions into decimal & vice versa 24. Concept of Percentage 25. Peg System of the Memory 26. Phonetics System of Memory 27. How to memorize all the Calendars? 28. How to find the difference between two dates? 29. How to add clock times? 30. How to memorize Long Digit Number? 31. How to memorize the Values of Different Constants in Physics and Mathematics? 32. LIST OF SQUARES WITH THEIR MNEMONICS 33. LIST OF SQUARE ROOTS WITH THEIR MNEMONICS 34. LIST OF NUMBERS WITH THEIR DIGIT VALUES 35. SUPER MEMORY POWER WORKSHOP 36. THE HANDBOOK OF POWERFUL MEMORY 37 SHREE CHAKRA POSTER FOR CONCENTRATION POWER

Q1. 93 * 86

A. 8098B. 9098C. 7998D. 9808

Sol : Option C

100 -86 = 14, 100 -93 = 7

14 * 7 = 98 (last two digits)

93-14= 86-7 =79

Therefore, the correct answer is 7998

Q2. 87 * 93

masterclass

A. 9801B. 9201C. 8091D. 8291

Sol : Option C

100 -87 = 13, 100 -93 = 7

13 * 7 = 91 (last two digits)

93-13= 87-7 = 80

Therefore, the correct answer is 8091

Q.3. 89 * 109

A. 9081B. 9281C. 9701D. 9401

Sol : Option C

100 -89 = 11, 100 -109 = -9

11 * -9 = -99 (100-99=01) (last two digits) (1 borrowed)

109-11-= 89+9 =98 -1 (borrowed) = 97

Therefore, the correct answer is 9701

Q.4. 47 * 44

A. 2018B. 2048C. 2028D. 2068

Sol : Option D

“In this case, we can take 50, which is a sub multiple of 100 or a multiple of 10 and proceed as follows:

50 -47 = 3, 50 -44 = 6

3 × 6 = 18 (last two digits)

47-6= 44 – 3= 41/2 = 20.5

= 20.5 × 100 =2050+18 =2068

Since 50 = 100/2, we divide the left hand side number also by 2 while retaining the right hand side. Therefore, the answer will be 2068.” Hence option D

Q.5. Find the square of 55

A. 2525B. 2925C. 3025D. 3125

Sol : Option D

552 ⇒ (5 * 6), 25 = 3025

Vedic Maths: Concept & Tricks

Vedic Maths : Solved Examples

Vedic Maths Practice Problems: Level 01

Vedic Maths Practice Problems: Level 02

Q.6. Find the square of 112

A. 11244B. 12544C. 13544D. 14544

Sol : Option B

(112) 2 = 112 + 12 | (12) 2 = 144 | (carry 4)44 = 12544

Q.7. 51 * 27

A. 1477B. 1277C. 1377D. 1777

Sol : Option C

51

27

Step 1: 1 * 7 = 07 (Write 07).

Step 2: 1 × 2 + 5 × 7 = 37 (Write 7 and 3 is carried over to the next step)

Step 3: 5 * 2 + 3 (Carried Over) = 13 (Write 13 because this is the last step)

Q8. 72 * 47

A. 3284B. 3384C. 3464D. 9084

Suggested Action:

Sol : Option B

72

47

Step 1: 2 * 7 = 14 (Write 4 and 1 is carried over to the next step)

Step 2: 7 * 7 + 2 × 4 + 1 (Carried Over) = 58 (Write 8 and 5 is carried over to the next step)

Step 3: 7 * 4 + 5 (Carried Over) = 33 (Write 27 because this is the last step)

Q9. 62 * 43

A. 2566B. 2466C. 2866D. 2666

Sol : Option D

62

43

Step 1: 2 * 3 = 6 (Write 6 which is the single digit number)

Step 2: 6 * 3 + 2 * 4 = 26 (Write 6 and 2 is carried over to the next step)

Step 3: 6 * 4 + 2 (Carried Over) = 26 (Write 26 as this is the last step).

Q10. Find the square of 82

A. 6724B. 6424C. 4824D. 8924

cat

Sol : Option A

(82) 2 = 82 – 18 | (18) 2 = 6724

1. Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5

For example Find (55) ² =?

Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30

2. Multiply a Number By 5

Even Number:

2464 x 5 =?

Step 1. 2464 / 2 = 1232

The answer will be 2464 x 5 = 12320

Odd Number:

3775 x 5

Step 1. Odd number; so ( 3775 – 1) / 2 = 1887

Step 2. As it is an odd number, so instead of 0 we will put 5

The answer will be 3775 x 5 = 18875

Now try —- 1234 x 5, 123 x 5

So our answer will be 3025.

3. Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000

For example:

1000 – 573 =? (Subtraction from 1000)

We simply subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10.

Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4

Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2

Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7

So, the answer is: (1000 – 573) = 427

4. Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11 – 19)

There are 4 steps to get the result:

Step 1. Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.
Step 2. Next, multiply the result by 10.
Step 3. Now, multiply the unit digits of both the 2-digit numbers.
Step 4. Then add both the numbers.

For example: Let’s take two numbers 13 & 15.
Step 1. 15 + 3 =18.
Step 2. 18*10 = 180.
Step 3. 3*5 = 15
Step 4. Add the two numbers, 180+15 and the answer is 195.

5. Dividing A Large Number By 5

1st step. Multiply the number by 2

2nd step: Move the decimal point to left.

For example: 245 / 5 =?

Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490

Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0 or just 49

Let’s try another: 2129 / 5

Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258

Step2: Move the decimal: 425.8 or just 425

Now you try to solve 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5

1. 121 Divided by 11 is

1. 11

2. 10

3. 19

4. 18

2. 60 Times of 8 Equals to

1. 480

2. 300

3. 250

4. 400

3. Find the Missing Term in Multiples of 6 : 6, 12, 18, 24, _, 36, 42, _ 54, 60.

1. 32, 45

2. 30, 48

3. 24, 40

4. 25, 49

4. What is the Next Prime Number after 7 ?

1. 13

2. 12

3. 14

4. 11

5. The Product of 131 × 0 × 300 × 4

1. 11

2. 0

3. 46

4. 45

6. Solve 3 + 6 × ( 5 + 4) ÷ 3 – 7

1. 11

2. 16

3. 14

4. 15

7.  Solve 23 + 3 ÷ 3

1. 24

2. 25

3. 26

4. 27

8. What is 6% Equals to

1. 0.06

2. 0.6

3. 0.006

4. 0.0006

9. How Many Years are there in a Decade?

1. 5 years

2. 10 years

3. 15 years

4. 20 years

10. How Many Months Make a Century?

1. 12

2. 120

3. 1200

4. 12000

Answer: c, 1200 months. As a century has a total of 100 years and each year has a total of 12 months, then a century will have a sum of 1200 months in it (100 × 12 = 1200 months).

11. Priya had 16 Red Balls, 2 Green Balls, 9  Blue Balls, and 1 Multicolor Ball. If He Lost 9 Red Balls, 1 Green Ball, and 3 Blue Balls. How Many Balls would be Left?

1. 15

2. 11

3. 28

4. 39

12. Add the Decimals 5.23 + 8.79

1. 14.02

2. 14.19

3. 14.11

4. 14.29

13. How Many Months Have 120 Days?

1. 2 months

2. 4 months

3. 11 months

4. 12 months

Answer: b, 4 months. As all months of a year have an average of 30 days in them, then four months of a year will include (4 × 30 = 120 days).

14. How Many Sides are there in a Decagon?

1. 7

2. 8

3. 9

4. 10

15. What Number Comes Before 9019?

1. 9099

2. 9091

3. 9109

4. None of these

Answer: D, None of these, All the numbers given are bigger than the number 9019, hence they will all come after this number. So, none of these numbers will come before 9019.

16. What is the product of 121 x 0 x 20 x 2.5 –

1. 6050

2. 0

3. 2,420

4. None of the above

Answer: b, 0 “Zero”. As anything multiplied by zero will always give the result of zero.

17. Look at this series: 36, 34, 30, 28, …, 22 What number should come to fill in the blank space

1. 25

2. 24

3. 26

4. None of the above

Answer: b, 0 “Zero”. As anything multiplied by zero will always give the result of zero.

18. 27 is a perfect cube. If true then what is the perfect cube of 27?

1. 9

2. 6

3. 3

1. 27 is not a perfect cube